judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRY E. STEPHENS v. GREGORY D. LAVITT and DEBRA C. LAVITT

Case Heading (S-10-0014)
Case Number:S-10-0014Case Docketed On:01/12/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:HARRY E. STEPHENS v. GREGORY D. LAVITT and DEBRA C. LAVITT
Full Title:HARRY E. STEPHENS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GREGORY D. LAVITT and DEBRA C. LAVITT, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHarry E. StephensFrank J. Jones
AppelleeGregory D. LavittMitchell H. Edwards
AppelleeDebra C. LavittMitchell H. Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contempt, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2010 WY 129
Citation:239 P.3d 634 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Errata to Brief of AppellantNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Additional Authority and Errata to Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/05/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Jones for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mitchell H. Edwards for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/29/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frank J. Jones for appellant; Mitchell H. Edwards for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/11/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/11/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/14/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal