judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NANCY HALL v. PARK COUNTY

Case Heading (S-10-0015)
Case Number:S-10-0015Case Docketed On:01/12/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:NANCY HALL v. PARK COUNTY
Full Title:NANCY HALL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. PARK COUNTY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNancy HallM. Jalie Meinecke
AppelleePark CountyLarry B. Jones
William L. Simpson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Limitation of Actions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 124
Citation:238 P.3d 580

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/25/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Park CountyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/03/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/05/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - M. Jaile Meinecke for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry B. Jones for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry Jones for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (M. Jalie Meinecke for appellant; Larry B .Jones for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Justice Voigt writing for the court. Chief Justice Kite files a dissenting opinion in which Justice Burke joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/21/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/27/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/23/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal