Case Information: 33580 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBINSON (RASHAD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135088 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/24/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/11/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/11/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00131 | |
03/02/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33353, 33491, 33566, 33580, 33582, 33604, 33605, 33727. | 99-01424 | |
06/24/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 99-05520 | |
06/24/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/08/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-19677 | |
12/05/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-19698 | |
12/05/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. | 00-19698 |