judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOUGLAS B. MCFADDEN, ET AL VS. D.C. OFFICE OF PLANNING

Case Information: 11-AA-0276
Short Caption:DOUGLAS B. MCFADDEN, ET AL VS. D.C. OFFICE OF PLANNINGClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Lead:11-AA-0276Consolidated: 12-AA-0363
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OP00005-10Filed Date:03/08/2011

Opening Event Date:03/08/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/17/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/31/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/07/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDouglas B. Mcfadden N
John M. ShoremanNN
PetitionerJohn Borsari N
John M. ShoremanYN
RespondentD.C. Office of PlanningN
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleNY
Bradley A. SarnellYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/08/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/08/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/08/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
03/24/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
03/25/2011TMC - petitioner's motion for stay - oppo
04/01/2011RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION - to petitioner's motion to stay
04/06/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987)... (BROBST) (rf)
10/18/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
10/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/24/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner Borsari)Granted
12/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify #1 (proc. 3/19/11)
12/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner Borsari)
01/30/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner Borsari, Petitioner Mcfadden)
01/30/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner Borsari, Petitioner Mcfadden)
03/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
03/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
03/30/2012FiledMotion To Consolidate w/12-AA-363 & for a new briefing schedule (Respondent)Granted
04/11/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Consolidate 11-AA-276 & 12-AA-363 , new briefing schedule & directing record in 12-AA-363
05/17/2012FiledRecord On Appeal (12-aa-363) w/ 2/7/12 hearing
05/17/2012FiledRecord Completed
05/25/2012FiledBriefing Order 12-AA-363
07/05/2012FiledBrief (12-AA-363) (Petitioner McFadden)
07/05/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner Mcfadden)
08/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
08/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
09/10/2012FiledBrief (Respondent)
09/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/04/2012FiledReply Brief (Petitioner Borsari, Petitioner Mcfadden)
11/28/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/31/2013FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Belson
07/10/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
08/07/2013FiledMandate