judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

R. W. HOLMAN v. MARY ARLENA DOW AND BANK OF THE SOUTHWEST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, HOUSTON

Case: B-2852
B-2852
07/13/1971
Application for Writ of Error
R. W. HOLMAN
MARY ARLENA DOW AND BANK OF THE SOUTHWEST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, HOUSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/08/1972Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/31/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/08/1972Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
01/17/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/31/1971Response to Petition
07/19/1971Miscellaneous Motion
07/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mary Arlena Dow and Bank of the Southwest National Association, HoustonRespondent
R. W. HolmanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information