judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KING (DARREN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33579
Short Caption:KING (DARREN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46200 , 67173 , 79646 , 79646-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C134803Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00130
01/13/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. October 6, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Debora L. Cecere. 99-00215
01/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 04/04/96; 05/14/96; 05/23/96; 10/29/96; 12/03/96; 12/17/96; 01/14/97; 01/20/97; 03/11/97; 03/14/97; 04/01/97; 05/01/97; 06/24/97; 07/03/97; 09/18/97; 05/18/98; 06/23/98; 07/14/98; 07/30/98; 08/04/98; 08/14/98; 08/19/98; 08/26/98; 09/01/98; 09/17/98; 09/21/98; 09/22/98; 09/23/98; 09/28/98; 09/29/98; 09/30/98; 10/01/98; 10/05/98; and 12/11/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: James Hellesso. 99-00454
01/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 08/19/98 and 08/20/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 99-00455
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00509
01/28/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 08/19/98 and 08/20/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Robert H. Mintun. 99-00617
02/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 1/15/99 99-00771
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days. 99-01018
02/25/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on January 7, 1999. 99-01292
03/03/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Transcripts). 99-01499
03/29/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Reporter Helleso shall, on or before April 15, 1999, file the transcripts requested in this appeal. 99-02239
04/19/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 05/23/96; 10/29/96; 12/03/96; 12/17/96; 01/30/97; 01/14/97; 03/11/97; 03/14/97; 04/01/97; 05/01/97; 06/24/97; 07/03/97; 09/18/97; 06/23/98; 07/14/98; 07/30/98; 08/04/98; 08/14/98; 09/01/98; 09/17/98; 09/21/98; 09/22/98; 09/23/98; 09/29/98; 09/28/98; 09/30/98; 10/01/98; 10/05/98; and 12/11/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: James Helleso. 99-03023
04/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/26/98. Court Reporter: James Helleso. 99-03203
04/29/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 11, 1999 99-03430
06/14/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 6/11/99. 99-05124
06/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-05125
06/21/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Permission to Supplement Opening Brief. 99-05393
07/16/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-06388
07/16/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file a 51 page Answering Brief. 99-06389
08/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On June 21, 1999, appellant filed a motion to file a supplement to the opening biref. The clerk shall forthwith file the supplement to appellant's opening brief provisionally submitted with the motion on June 21, 1999, and shall insert the supplement inside the front cover of the opening biref. On July 16, 1999, respondent file a motion for an extension of time and leave to file a 51 page answering brief. The clerk shall forthwith file the answering brief and respondent's appendix provisionally submitted with the motions. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file a reply brief. 99-07404
08/11/1999BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplement to Opening Brief. 99-05394
08/11/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. 99-06390
08/11/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-06391
08/20/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address for attorney Karen A. Connolly. Now associated with Connolly & Fujii. 99-07787
08/20/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 8/17/99. 99-07796
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 99-13011
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted on the briefs to the Southern Nevada panel this day.
03/13/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Maupin, J. We concur: Shearing, J. and Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 38. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03876
04/03/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (The State of Nevada). 00-05355
04/03/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Darren King). 00-05356
04/17/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d). Returned to attorney Karen A. Connolly w/letter.
06/09/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Appellant and respondent have petitioned for rehearing. "Both petitions are denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09726
06/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11018
06/27/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2000. 00-11018