judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTIAN GUIER, M.D. v. TETON COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a ST. JOHN'S MEDICAL CENTER

Case Heading (S-09-0259)
Case Number:S-09-0259Case Docketed On:12/17/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:CHRISTIAN GUIER, M.D. v. TETON COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a ST. JOHN'S MEDICAL CENTER
Full Title:CHRISTIAN GUIER, M.D., Appellant (Petitioner), v. TETON COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, d/b/a ST. JOHN'S MEDICAL CENTER, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristian Guier M.D.Weston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeTeton County Hospital DistrictJanet Lewis
Thomas E. Lubnau II
Mark A. Kadzielski

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2011 WY 31
Citation:248 P.3d 623

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/17/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/17/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/29/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's unopposed motion to extend time to file appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/03/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellee indicating that Ms. Van Genderen will no longer be involved with the case, and removed her name as counsel.EventPhone CallFinal
02/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitutionNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
02/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Thomas E. Lubnau for Appellee (hard copy of attorney substitution)Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/18/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of AppearanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
04/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. KadzielskiEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2010Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
04/15/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee, received five copies of brief, counsel will get sixth copy in the mailEventPhone CallFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record (containing fourteen (14) volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Lubnau for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W.W. Reeves for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Anna M. Reeves Olson and Weston W. Reeves, argument by Mr. Reeves for appellant; Janet Lewis and Thomas E. Lubnau II, argument by Mr. Lubnau for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/14/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/14/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/16/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal