judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFREY A. STAUFFER V. D.C. POLICE & FIRE RETIRE BD.

Case Information: 11-AA-0273
Short Caption:JEFFREY A. STAUFFER V. D.C. POLICE & FIRE RETIRE BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FD2034-09Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/13/2013
Argued/Submitted:11/21/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/12/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJeffrey A. Stauffer N
Frederic W. Schwartz, Jr.YY
RespondentD.C. Police & Firefighters' Retirement & Relief BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Bradley A. SarnellNN
James C. McKay, Jr.YY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/07/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
03/07/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
04/25/2012FiledRecord On Appeal w/cd
04/25/2012FiledRecord Completed
05/02/2012FiledBriefing Order
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
07/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
07/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 8/6/12
08/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
08/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
08/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 4,2012 (Petitioner)Granted
09/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 4,2012 (Petitioner)
09/12/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
09/12/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
10/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 11/19/12
11/15/2012FiledMotion to hold this appeal in abeyance (Respondent)Granted
11/29/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion to hold this appeal in abeyance (Respondent)
11/29/2012VacatedOrder Sua Sponte Staying Appeal
01/28/2013FiledNotice Received report of respondent pursuant to 11/29/12 order (Petitioner)
02/07/2013FiledStatement regarding report (Respondent)
02/07/2013FiledMiscellaneous notice of corrected certicicate of service on a status report (Respondent)
02/26/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte - vacating stay & directing brief of respondent
02/26/2013FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
03/28/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief May 28, 2013 (Respondent)Granted
04/03/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief May 28, 2013 (Respondent)
05/28/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
06/05/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 6/28/13
06/13/2013FiledBrief (Respondent)
06/13/2013FiledAppendix (Respondent)
06/13/2013FiledBriefing Completed
07/05/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/10/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)
07/15/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/18/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Respondent)
07/31/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 8/16/13
08/16/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Petitioner)
08/16/2013FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
09/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/21/2013FiledArgued Before Associate Jugdes Fisher, and McLeese, and Senior Judge Belson. (Frederic W. Schwartz Esq.,for petitioner) ( James C. McKay Esq.,for respondent).
11/27/2013FiledBriefing Order
01/06/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File supplemental brief Brief (Petitioner)Granted
01/23/2014FiledOrder Granting motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief.
01/23/2014FiledSupplemental Brief (Petitioner)
01/24/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Supplemental Brief (Respondent)Granted
02/05/2014FiledOrder Granting respondent motion for extension to file Supl. brief.
02/28/2014FiledSupplemental Brief (Respondent)
04/18/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and McLeese, Associate Judges; and Belson, Senior Judge)
05/12/2014FiledMandate