judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY AND STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WILLIAM E. CARTER

Case: B-2851
B-2851
07/13/1971
Application for Writ of Error
UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY AND STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
WILLIAM E. CARTER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/21/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/19/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/27/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/26/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/25/1971Response to Motion filed
10/21/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/19/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/14/1971Notice of Appearance
10/06/1971Opinion issued
07/27/1971Response to Petition
07/26/1971Response to Petition
07/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William E. CarterRespondent
United States Fire Insurance Company and Standard Fire Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information