judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SEHER (DOUGLAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38377
Short Caption:SEHER (DOUGLAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFO010294Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14347
09/17/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/30/01; 5/31/01; 7/23/01. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. 01-15707
09/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 9, 2001. 01-16351
10/09/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16979
10/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16980
10/22/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17722
10/22/2001MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Pro Se Appellant's Motion for Default Judgment. 01-17727
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20917
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00230
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 10, 2002. 02-00230