judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARAMIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT v. KENNETH COOK

Case Heading (S-11-0152)
Case Number:S-11-0152Case Docketed On:06/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:LARAMIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT v. KENNETH COOK
Full Title:LARAMIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, Appellant (Respondent), v. KENNETH COOK, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLaramie County Sheriff's DepartmentSylvia Lee Hackl
AppelleeKenneth CookStephen H. Kline
Melinda S. McCorkle

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 47
Citation:272 P.3d 866 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/17/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/01/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/01/2011Service - Amended Certificate of ServiceServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of brief on cd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Melinda S. McCorkle for AppelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of brief on cd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Kline and Melinda McCorkle for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Sylvia Hackl for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/12/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record (SEALED RECORD); Volume III, Transcripts (SEALED RECORD).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/12/2011Event - Phone Call - Called district court clerk to request fax of motion and order sealing record.EventPhone CallFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleading - Received faxed copy of motion and order sealing the record in the district court.Notice-IncomingDistrict Court PleadingFinal
11/08/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Sylvia Lee Hackl, Deputy County attorney for appellant; Stephen H. Kline and Melinda S. McCorkle, argument by Mr. Kline for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/28/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/18/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/17/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal