judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BONNIE CAIN V. VICTOR REINOSO, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0249
Short Caption:BONNIE CAIN V. VICTOR REINOSO, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8120-08Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:10/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/05/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBonnie Cain N
John P. RacinYN
James R. KlimaskiNN
Lynn I. MillerNN
AppelleeVictor Reinoso N
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleYY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 23, 2011, and it appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/17/2011STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S) (*to determine whether trial court erred in its judgment) (elp)
03/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
03/23/2011RECORD INDEX
03/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/10/11
05/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 10, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 7/1/11
06/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/01/2011APPENDIX
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - until September 6, 2011 Brief (Appellee District of Columbia, Appellee Reinoso)Granted
08/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File - until September 6, 2011 Brief (Appellee District of Columbia, Appellee Reinoso)
09/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief 30 Days (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief 30 Days (Appellee District of Columbia)
09/23/2011FiledMotion - for leave to file a confidential supplemental joint appendix under seal (Appellant)Granted
09/29/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion - for leave to file a confidential supplemental joint appendix under seal (Appellant) and redirecting appellees' brief
09/29/2011FiledAppendix - Supplemental (Joint) ***Confidential*** (Appellant) ****FILED UNDER SEAL*******************
10/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellee District of Columbia, Appellee Reinoso)
10/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief - until November 15, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
11/04/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief - until November 15, 2011 (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/05/2012FiledArgued Before Glickman,Beckwith,Ferren John P. Racin Esq.,for appellant Carl J. Schifferle Esq.,for appellee
05/10/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.)
05/24/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
06/04/2012FiledMiscellaneous erratum to petition for rehearing en banc (Appellant)
05/02/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc.
05/10/2013FiledMandate