judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4441
A-4441
12/31/1953
Application for Writ of Error
ELLEN L. EVANS
SOUTHWESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/02/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/06/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/04/1954Errata FiledPetitioner
12/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/06/1954Motion for Leave to file Motion for RehearingRefused
02/02/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/06/1954Response to Petition
01/04/1954Errata Filed
12/31/1953Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
12/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
12/31/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ellen L. EvansPetitioner
Southwestern Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information