judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FAYE MOSBY V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 11-AA-0299
Short Caption:FAYE MOSBY V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00163-11Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/17/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerFaye Mosby YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/10/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/23/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 10, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
03/23/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 2/14/11 hearing
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/29/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/29/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)(Served by: DCCA on 8/29/11.
08/29/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/03/2011FiledMotion to vacate and remand and to hold briefing in abeyance until disposition of the motion to vacate and remand (Respondent)
10/17/2011FiledOrder Granting - Motion to vacate order on appeal and remand and to hold briefing in abeyance until disposition of the motion to vacate and remand (Respondent)
10/17/2011FiledRemanded
10/17/2011FiledMandate