Case Information: 12-FM-0408 | |||
Short Caption: | HENOK ARAYA V AIDA KELETA | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Other Family |
Lead: | 11-FM-1105 | Consolidated: | 11-FM-1192 , 11-FM-1230 , 12-FM-0361 , 12-FM-0408 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DRB3351-09 | Filed Date: | 03/20/2012 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/20/2012 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/28/2012 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/26/2013 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Henok Araya | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Aida Keleta | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
03/20/2012 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
04/18/2012 | Filed | Order Granting APPELLEE'S Motion To Consolidate 12FM361 W/11FM1105, 11FM1192, 11FM1230 & 12FM70 and SS CONSOLIDATING W/12FM408 and... | ||
04/18/2012 | Filed | FURTHER ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IN 12FM361 and APPELLANT'S DC APP. R.28 (k) LETTER IS DENIED AS MOOT and | ||
04/18/2012 | Filed | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN 12FM361 and 12FM408 SHALL BE FILED w/n 30 DAYS and APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF W/N 30 DAYS AFTER | ||
04/26/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Brief (12FM361 & 12FM408) (Appellant) | ||
05/07/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant) 12 FM 70 | ||
05/09/2012 | Filed | Motion To Stay Appeal for injunction 12-fm-361 (Appellant) | Denied | |
05/10/2012 | Filed | Record Index ( 12-fm-408) | ||
05/10/2012 | Filed | Record Index (12-fm-361) | ||
05/10/2012 | Filed | TMC//MOTION FOR INJUNCTION/STAY | ||
05/18/2012 | Filed | ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY and SS, that the CLERK SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY ADDITIONAL FILINGS BY APPELLANT IN THESE APPEALS - - EXCEPT A REPLY BRIEF | ||
05/29/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Brief (Appellee) | ||
06/07/2012 | Filed | Reply Brief (supplemental) (Appellant) | ||
06/25/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | ||
07/03/2012 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | ||
07/16/2012 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee) | ||
10/02/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
11/28/2012 | Filed | Argued Before Judges Glickamn,Thompson,Mcleese, Henok Araya Pro Se for appellant, Johnny M. Riddick Esq.,for appellee. | ||
03/21/2013 | Filed | Affirmed (OPINION) (Glickman, Thompson, and McLeese, Associate Judges.) | ||
04/01/2013 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing (Appellant) | Denied | |
04/01/2013 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) | Denied | |
04/19/2013 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's petition for rehearing. | ||
05/10/2013 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc. | ||
05/16/2013 | Filed | Motion To Stay Issuance Of The Mandate (Appellant) | Denied | |
05/30/2013 | Filed | Order Denying aplt's motion to stay mandate. | ||
08/09/2013 | Filed | Copy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant) | ||
11/26/2013 | Filed | Mandate (11-FM-1105, 11-FM-1192, 12-FM-361) | ||
11/26/2013 | Filed | Mandate (11-FM-1230 & 12-FM-408) |