judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FARRIS (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34634
Short Caption:FARRIS (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C124138Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07282
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34600, 34624, 34634, 34650, 34651, 34659, 34662. 99-09662
01/18/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on: 01/14/00. 00-00749
01/18/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Having conducted a preliminary review of the record, we conclude that our review of additional documents is warranted. Supplemental record due: 30 days. The supplemental record on appeal shall contain a certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on each of the following dates: December 4, 1997 and January 8, 1998. 01-09208
06/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/04/97 and 01/08/98. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky (In response to Order filed 6/4/01). 01-10152
06/20/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 3. Transcripts for December 4, 1997 and January 8, 1998. 01-10448
07/03/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-11173
07/31/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11256
07/31/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11256