judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRY NEIDLINGER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0062)
Parent: 06-292 Case Docketed On:03/19/2007
Consolidated:S-07-0062
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:TERRY NEIDLINGER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TERRY NEIDLINGER, SR., Appellant (Defendant) v. THE STATE OF WYOMING Appellee (Plaintiff)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerry Earl Neidlinger Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Daniel Michael Fetsco

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 2004
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/20/2007Motion - Consolidate with case No. 06-292MotionConsolidateFinal
03/22/2007Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/21/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
07/31/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/21/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirmed in part and reversed and remanded in part. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/20/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card from WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/7/08 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal