judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THEODORE STATON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0811
Short Caption:THEODORE STATON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3019-78Filed Date:07/02/1980

Opening Event Date:07/02/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/02/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/05/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheodore Staton N
Steven H. GoldblattYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John E. Stevens YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STATON, THEODORE UNITED STATES
07/02/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/02/1983FiledRecord Completed
03/21/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/05/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/17/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition