judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAFFE VS. REID

Case Information: 33572
Short Caption:JAFFE VS. REIDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A324036Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Leavitt, TerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Victor Lee Miller--check no. 9820.
01/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00099
01/08/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Terry V. Leavitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 1/25/99. 99-00630
03/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement due: 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-01575
04/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement or risk the immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 99-03280
05/07/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter regarding settlement of this case. 99-03687
06/28/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 99-05665
07/07/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-05966
07/07/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.