judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUANE ALLEN ERWIN v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES; and CHERRIN B. GODAK

Case Heading (S-09-0250)
Case Number:S-09-0250Case Docketed On:12/03/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DUANE ALLEN ERWIN v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES; and CHERRIN B. GODAK
Full Title:DUANE ALLEN ERWIN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES; and CHERRIN B. GODAK, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDuane Allen Erwin Pro Se
AppelleeDepartment of Family ServicesBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Jill E. Kucera
Elizabeth Bartels Lance
AppelleeCherrin B. Godak Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Res judicata/Collateral estoppel
Opinion Number:2010 WY 117
Citation:237 P.3d 409

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/07/2009Service - Mail returned, time for forward expired, resent docketing letter to Appellee Godak.ServiceMail returnedFinal
01/20/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/20/2010Event - Phone Call - Left phone message for Mr. Erwin. Received seven copies of the brief. Asked him to mail the original page 50 and we would insert that page into one of the copies. Also notified him to serve the Attorney General's Office with a copy of the brief and provide a certificate of service stating such.EventPhone CallFinal
01/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Errata to Brief of AppellantNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by Appellant. (Supreme Court caption, served on District Court Clerk)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/25/2010Service - Amended Certificate of Service - Wyoming Attorney General with Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
01/25/2010Service - Amended Certificate of Service - Wyoming Attorney General with Errata to Brief of AppellantServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Received original signature page for Brief of Appellant and inserted into pleading.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/09/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellee Cherrin B. GodakBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
03/09/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Department of Family Services; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/29/2010Brief - Appellant reply and copy of Additional Designation of RecordBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/30/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - receieved email notification of new phone number for appellant.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/08/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Statement of Evidence.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/27/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/7/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for writ of certiorari was filed November 12, 2010.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
04/01/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Writ of certiorari denied.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal