judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LACY WALL V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 11-AA-0271
Short Caption:LACY WALL V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPW08649-10Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/01/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLacy Wall NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/07/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/07/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
01/25/2012FiledRecord On Appeal w/ hearing 2/2/11
02/01/2012FiledRecord Completed
02/03/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/20/2012FiledOrder - directing motion, brief & appendix
04/26/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
04/26/2012FiledDismissed
05/18/2012FiledMandate