judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LABOR COMMISSION VS. SMITH

Case Information: 33571
Short Caption:LABOR COMMISSION VS. SMITHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800996AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Jenkins, NathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00092
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/26/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00537
02/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-00685
02/04/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal; Points and Authorities. 99-00803
02/08/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, unfiled, with letter, Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
02/12/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-01004
03/09/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. 99-01641
03/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01790
03/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). Respondent's pending motion to dismiss is denied as moot. SNP/CLK 99-01881
03/16/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.