judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK A. DORR v. SMITH, KELLER & ASSOCIATES

Case Heading (S-09-0249)
Case Number:S-09-0249Case Docketed On:12/03/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:MARK A. DORR v. SMITH, KELLER & ASSOCIATES
Full Title:MARK A. DORR, Appellant (Defendant), v. SMITH, KELLER & ASSOCIATES, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark A. DorrGreg L. Goddard
AppelleeSmith, Keller & AssociatesW. Perry Dray
Timothy Lance Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2010 WY 120
Citation:238 P.3d 549 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/07/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of SameEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/22/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's response to motion to dismiss appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2010Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
03/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/19/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District CourtNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/22/2010Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/23/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/31/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Original Record from Supreme Court Docket 96-86 & 96-87 (Volumes VII & VIII).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/27/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/24/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/10/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal