judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HERBERT MURPHY V. KEYA COOPER

Case Information: 11-FM-0268
Short Caption:HERBERT MURPHY V. KEYA COOPERClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3093-03Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHerbert Murphy Y
Dalton J. HowardNY
AppelleeKeya Cooper N
Lisa H. OrlowNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 23, 2011, and it appea ring that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
03/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 10/13/10 4/2/10 7/27/09 4/29/09 2/6/09 (rt. needed)
03/24/2011RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (24 pgs/tape) 8/28/08 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (25 pgs/tape) 10/27/08 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (75 pgs/tape) 2/6/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (101 pgs/tape) 4/29/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (43 pgs/tape) 7/27/09 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (33 pgs/tape) 4/2/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (52 pgs/tape) 10/13/10 proc. w/cd
04/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX
04/12/2011RECORD COPIES
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 29, 2011
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 29, 2011. (JAC)
08/03/2011FiledOrder - directing motion, brief and appendix
08/17/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal proceedings (Appellant Murphy)Granted
09/09/2011VacatedOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal
10/14/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Appellee)Granted
10/21/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal or require aplt to file brief within a reasonable time and response to aplt's court ordered report (Appellee)Held in Abeyance
11/16/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Appellee), vacate stay, directing brief & appendix, held in abeyance appellee's motion to dismiss
11/16/2011FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
11/16/2011FiledStatus Report regarding pending settlement (Appellant Murphy)
11/16/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/20/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Granted
12/28/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
12/28/2011FiledDismissed
01/23/2012FiledMandate