judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YALE PRESTON v. MARATHON OIL COMPANY and THOMAS SMITH

Case Heading (S-11-0166)
Case Number:S-11-0166Case Docketed On:07/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:United States Court of Appeals for Federal CircuitCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals
Short Title:YALE PRESTON v. MARATHON OIL COMPANY and THOMAS SMITH
Full Title:YALE PRESTON, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MARATHON OIL COMPANY and THOMAS SMITH, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantYale PrestonPhilip A. Nicholas
Mitchell H. Edwards
AppelleeMarathon Oil CompanyMark Richard Ruppert
Shane P. Coleman
Joanna R. Vilos
Tyler John Garrett
AppelleeThomas SmithMark Richard Ruppert
Shane P. Coleman
Joanna R. Vilos
Tyler John Garrett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 66
Citation:277 P.3d 31 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/13/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/13/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
07/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Duplicate copy of Certification OrderNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/09/2011Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
08/11/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
08/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' motion for admission pro hac vice of Shane P. Coleman; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Shane P. Coleman for AppelleesOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
09/26/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Appellant's Statement of Costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2011Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
11/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Marathon Oil Company and Thomas SmithEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark R. Ruppert for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mitchell Edwards for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/11/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mitchell H. Edwards for appellant; Tyler John Garrett and Mark R. Ruppert, argument by Mr. Ruppert for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/11/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified question. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/29/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal