judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CATENA OFFURUM V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 11-AA-0306
Short Caption:CATENA OFFURUM V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OAHPWK0001452-09Filed Date:03/11/2011

Opening Event Date:03/11/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCatena Offurum NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/11/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/11/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/11/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd, Kim, Esq.
03/21/2011 ORDERED that CATENA OFURUM shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for LACK OF JURISDICTION since she was not a party below and since she is not an attorney she cannot file an appeal on another person's behalf,...OR as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER since a motion for reconsideration is not independently appealable... (BY: ETW)
03/21/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/11/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
05/05/2011 ORDERED that this PETITION IS DISMISSED as Ms. Offurum lacks standing since she was not a party to the proceeding below...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PETITION IS DENIED to the extent it seeks review of a motion for reconsideration... (THKNTE)
05/05/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED