judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: CATHERINE LYNNETTE MORRIS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0167)
Case Number:S-11-0167Case Docketed On:07/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: CATHERINE LYNNETTE MORRIS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: CATHERINE LYNNETTE MORRIS, Appellant (Employee-Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCatherine Lynnette MorrisJames Corey Worthen
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
Kelly Roseberry
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 71
Citation:276 P.3d 399

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
07/14/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
07/14/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/19/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
08/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/26/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/23/2011Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
09/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee/Respondent's motion to dismiss appeal, or in the alternative, for relief pursuant to Wyo. R. App. P. 1.03, and memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee/Respondent's motion for abeyance of briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2011Record - Other - Letter from District Court Clerk to counsel for Appellee forwarding transcripts.RecordOtherFinal
10/10/2011Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
10/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's response and memorandum in opposition to appellee/respondent's motion to dismiss appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2011Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
10/18/2011Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal, Order Denying Motion to Stay Briefing, and Order Requiring Appellant to File Brief that Complies with W.R.A.P. 7.01OrderDenyFinal
10/31/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Brief of Appellant/Employee-Claimant Catherine Lynette MorrisEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant/Employee-Claimant Catherine Lynette MorrisEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/10/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Volumes III-IV, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/17/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/22/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/11/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/8/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/21/2012Event - Phone Call re motion for attorney fees, advised that case is now closed.EventPhone CallFinal