judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERALD KORWIN HOFSTAD v. CATHRYN ANNE CHRISTIE

Case Heading (S-09-0246)
Case Number:S-09-0246Case Docketed On:11/25/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:JERALD KORWIN HOFSTAD v. CATHRYN ANNE CHRISTIE
Full Title:JERALD KORWIN HOFSTAD, Appellant (Respondent), v. CATHRYN ANNE CHRISTIE, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJerald Korwin HofstadKeith Robert Nachbar
AppelleeCathryn Anne ChristieHarry G. Bondi

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2010 WY 134
Citation:240 P.3d 816

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/25/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/25/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/12/2010Brief - Appellant (Replacement - Filed 1/12/10 without redactions)BriefAppellantFinal
01/13/2010Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appeal by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/23/2010Brief - Appellee (Replacement - Filed 2/23/10 without redactions)BriefAppelleeFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2010Order - Other - Order requesting Replacement BriefsOrderOtherFinal
03/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Errata to Appellee's BriefNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
03/08/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/15/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
10/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card- Record signed for 10/26/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal