judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILES (RANDY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38395
Short Caption:MILES (RANDY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011317Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-14571
09/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-15198
09/17/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdraw of Appeal. 01-15631
09/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion filed September 17, 2001, is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-16410
09/28/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.