judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FREMONT COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT and RIVERTON POLICE DEPARTMENT v. REBECCA STROM

Case Heading (S-09-0245)
Case Number:S-09-0245Case Docketed On:11/24/2009
Linked To: S-09-0244
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:FREMONT COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT and RIVERTON POLICE DEPARTMENT v. REBECCA STROM
Full Title:FREMONT COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT and RIVERTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, Petitioners, v. REBECCA STROM, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerFremont County Sheriff's DepartmentRichard Rideout
PetitionerRiverton Police DepartmentRichard Rideout
RespondentRebecca StromJohn H. Robinson
Richard Robert Jamieson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 64
Citation:252 P.3d 939

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/24/2009Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
12/14/2009Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
01/28/2010Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
01/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioners' opening brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Index of Record on AppealNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/11/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated motion for extension of time to file; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/15/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/03/2010Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
05/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of RespondentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
05/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate Setting.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Robinson for respondent.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/28/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Rideout for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Robinson for Rebecca StromNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for appellee Strom.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Richard Rideout for appellant; John H. Robinson and Laurence W. Stinson for appellees.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal