judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. THOMAS A. YOUNG

Case Information: 11-CV-0265
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. THOMAS A. YOUNGClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR1167-07Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/02/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY
AppelleeThomas A. Young N
Martin F. McMahonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 25, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/17/2011RECORD INDEX
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/21/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days.
05/19/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 1, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/01/2011APPENDIX
07/13/2011FiledOrder directing appellee's brief, accompanied by a motion for leave
08/05/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone.
08/05/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/02/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Schwelb
03/08/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge)
03/30/2012FiledMandate