Case Information: 09-CO-1007 | |||
Short Caption: | ANTOINE B. JONES V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | FEL2519-00 | Filed Date: | 08/13/2009 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/13/2009 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/30/2009 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/04/2010 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/07/2010 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/04/2010 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Antonie B. Jones | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/13/2009 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/01/2009 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 13, 2009, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: GP) | |||
09/30/2009 | RECORD INDEX | |||
09/30/2009 | RECORD COPIES | |||
09/30/2009 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
10/06/2009 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: GP) | |||
11/19/2009 | On consideration of this court's order of October 6, 2009, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (GP) | |||
12/02/2009 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (No Appendix attached). | |||
12/24/2009 | It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on December 2, 2009, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before December 9, 2009, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (GP) | |||
02/04/2010 | ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW) | |||
02/04/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
02/18/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of Order of Dismissal. | |||
03/09/2010 | ORDERED: That appellant shall file the limited appendix within 15 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the denial of the motion for reconsideration. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (By: ETW) | |||
03/19/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL | |||
03/24/2010 | APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief. | |||
04/05/2010 | ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and this appeal is hereby reinstated and the Clerk shall file appellant's lodged limited appendix. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW) | |||
04/05/2010 | APPENDIX | |||
04/30/2010 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 4, 2010 | |||
05/17/2010 | On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 4, 2010. (By: GP) | |||
06/04/2010 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
06/04/2010 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/16/2010 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
06/29/2010 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
08/17/2010 | LETTER - from aple re: transcripts | |||
08/25/2010 | CALENDAR NOTICE SENT | |||
10/07/2010 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/07/2010 | SUBMITTED to Judges Reid, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker | |||
10/13/2010 | AFFIRMED MOJ (Reid, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker) | |||
11/04/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED |