judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KOINZAN (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33582
Short Caption:KOINZAN (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50176
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C144024Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/18/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00132
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33353, 33491, 33566, 33580, 33582, 33604, 33605, 33727. 99-01425
06/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 99-05286
06/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP
06/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Markoff & Boyers (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-09381
06/05/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reopen the Briefing Schedule and Motion to Rescind Order Taking Case Under Submission. 00-09382
06/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because appellant has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents in this appeal, the clerk of this court shall forthwith return, unfiled, appellant's motions of February 18, 1999, March 24, 1999, and April 23, 1999. On June 5, 2000, attorney Martin R. Boyers filed a notice of appearance as counsel of record for appellant and a motion to reopen the briefing schedule. We grant appellant's motion. We vacate our prior submission of this appeal for decision the the record. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the dte of this order, file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and shall have to and including October 10, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-10253
06/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to appellant John Derrick Koinzan: original proper person motions of February 18, 1999, March 24, 1999, and April 23, 1999.
07/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11326
07/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-11327
10/05/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-17670
10/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time, to and including December 22, 2000, within which to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 00-18129
12/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21934
12/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including February 7, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-22711
02/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-02545
02/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement the motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit containing the above-described assertions. We suspend the briefing schedule for this case pepnding further order of this court. 01-03458
03/16/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal and Verification. 01-04698
04/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-06348
04/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.