judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROMEO ROACH V. SAFEWAY INCORPORATED

Case Information: 11-AA-0279
Short Caption:ROMEO ROACH V. SAFEWAY INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00012-11Filed Date:03/09/2011

Opening Event Date:03/09/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/26/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRomeo Roach NPro SeN
RespondentSafeway IncorporatedNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/09/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW Denied as Moot
03/09/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/09/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Safeway, Inc. is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
04/22/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 18, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
05/03/2011LETTER from Petitioner with attached courtesy copy of new ruling, by OAH, in this appeal.
05/19/2011DISMISSED On consideration of petitioner's letter to the court, and it appearing that the Office of Administrative Hearings vacated the order subject to this petition on April 6, 2011, but jurisdiction remained with this court, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this petition for review is hereby dismissed as moot. It is (MORE)
05/19/2011REMANDED F/O that this case is hereby remanded to the Office of Administrative Hearings with directions to re-enter its April 6, 2011 order, upon transfer of jurisdiction. It is F/O that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ETW)
05/26/2011MANDATE ISSUED