judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLEMAN (PADRAIG) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33583
Short Caption:COLEMAN (PADRAIG) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148920Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (fast track notice mailed to all counsel). 99-00134
02/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned. 99-01323
03/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Withdraw of Appeal. 99-01630
03/15/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service 99-01845
03/31/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On March 8, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02395
03/31/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.