judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT K. BROWN v. CITY OF CASPER and OFFICER ERIC E. WALTERS, Individually

Case Heading (S-09-0263)
Case Number:S-09-0263Case Docketed On:12/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:ROBERT K. BROWN v. CITY OF CASPER and OFFICER ERIC E. WALTERS, Individually
Full Title:ROBERT K. BROWN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CITY OF CASPER and OFFICER ERIC E. WALTERS, Individually, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert K. BrownThomas A. Valdez
Tamara Schroeder Crolla
AppelleeCity of CasperPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeEric E. WaltersBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Thomas W. Rumpke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 35
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
12/30/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
12/30/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/04/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Thomas W. Rumpke on behalf of Appellee WaltersNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2010Event - Phone Call to Counsel for Appellant requesting signed original.EventPhone CallFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Original signed by counselNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/03/2010Brief - Appellee - City of Casper, WyomingBriefAppelleeFinal
03/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, City of Casper, WyomingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/22/2010Brief - Appellee - Eric E. WaltersBriefAppelleeFinal
03/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Officer Eric E. Walters, Individually.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for appellee City of Casper.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas W. Rumpke for appellee Walters.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/15/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Continuance of Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to vacate oral argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/21/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Rumpke for appellee Walters.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for appellee City of Casper.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Valdez for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/15/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Thomas A. Valdez for appellant; Thomas W. Rumpke, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Patrick J. Murphy for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Golden filed a specially concurring opinion and Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/15/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/15/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/17/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/16/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal