judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ALEXANDER CADENA, ET UX. v. JAMES W. KNIGHT, COUNTY CLERK

Case: B-2840
B-2840
07/08/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ALEXANDER CADENA, ET UX.
JAMES W. KNIGHT, COUNTY CLERK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/06/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/23/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/08/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/25/1971Response to Motion filed
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/06/1971Opinion issued
08/06/1971Reply to Response
07/23/1971Response to Petition
07/08/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/08/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James W. Knight, County ClerkRespondent
Alexander Cadena, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information