judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COUNTY OF CLARK VS. SCHANDA

Case Information: 33581
Short Caption:COUNTY OF CLARK VS. SCHANDACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A315833
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A318078
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Leavitt, RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice RosePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Singer, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/18/2001 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/18/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00133
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael H. Singer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/26/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 12/15/98. Due Date: 10 days
02/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 12/15/98. 99-00770
02/11/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter. Michael H. Singer (amended judgment).
02/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement. 99-01145
02/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-01228
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 99-02377
04/12/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-02775
04/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspendedpending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court. 99-03082
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 99-03379
05/10/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. October 8, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 99-03708
06/01/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause Concerning Jurisdiction of the Court. 99-04499
06/01/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. James J. Leavitt and Laura Fitzsimmons.
06/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant responded on June 1, 1999, to our order to show cause. We direct the clerk to strike the docketing statement previously filed by appellant. Appellant shall have 14 days to file a docketing statement, 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-05070
07/06/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-05885
10/15/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 11, 1999. 99-10036
11/12/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-11146
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 30 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcrit request. fn1[On May 10, 1999, the court reporter filed a copy of a transcript of the October 8, 1999, lower court proceeding with this court. Appellant need not request this transcript again]. This court does not expect further requests for extensions of time. 99-12997
01/07/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Court's Order Regarding Transcripts. 00-00283
01/11/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/3/93; 12/8/94; 12/16/94; 3/30/95; 5/22/95; 5/23/95; 5/24/95; 5/25/95; 5/26/95; 5/30/95; 6/1/95. Court Reporters: Tom Mercer and David A. Robinson. 00-00451
01/21/2000Other Other. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Due 10 days.
01/21/2000Other Other. Returned Unfiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Due 10 days.
02/07/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 2/1/00. 00-01866
02/07/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-01869
02/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 00-02122
02/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In the event no additional transcripts are needed (other than the transcripts filed 01/11/00) appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a certificate of no transcript request. If additional transcripts are required, appellant shall file and serve within this time period a transcript request form. 00-03040
03/03/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 3, 2000. 00-03362
03/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 3, 1993, December 2, 1994, December 8, 1994, December 16, 1994, March 27, 1995, March 30, 1995 and August 21, 1995. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 00-03574
03/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 22-23, 30-31 and June 1-2, 1995. To Court Reporter: David Robinson. 00-03575
03/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Mailing. 00-03937
04/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-05342
04/05/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Respondents' answering brief shall be served and filed on or before April 10, 2000. 00-05503
04/12/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 4/10/00. 00-05842
05/10/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 5/8/00. 00-07693
08/18/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
10/09/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 16, 2000 at 8:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-1 - WM/CY/NB)
10/19/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Continue Oral Argument. 00-18543
10/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Continue Oral Argument. (Corrected) 00-18643
10/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Rescheduling. We grant respondents' motion to continue the oral argument in this matter. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for November 16, 2000, at 8:30 a.m. in Las Vegas, and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument on January 18, 2001, at 8:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 00-18963
11/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Rescheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is rescheduled for 30 minutes on January 18, 2001 at 9:30 a.m. in Carson City. (SNP00A-1 - WM/CY/NB)
12/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/18/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP00A-1-CY/WM/NB
04/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding."ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART with respect to the imposition of interest, AND REVERSED IN PART with regard to the county's claim of setoff . . . we REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn10[We note that the legislature's recent amendment to NRS 37.175 -- providing that landowners receive prejudgment interest at the prime rate plus two percent -- lends additional credence to this conclusion.] SNP00A-1-WM/CY/NB 01-05851
04/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Clark County District Attorney. Returned the original transcripts dated: 5/3/93; 12/8/94; 12/16/94; 3/30/95; 5/22/95; 5/23/95; 5/24/95; 5/25/95; 5/26/95; 5/30/95; and 6/1/95, received from your office on January 7, 2000. Certified copies of the above dated transcripts were filed on January 11, 2000.
05/01/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06054
05/01/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. 01-06054