judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AKOBUCHI UDOH V. WASHINGTON CENTER FOR AGING

Case Information: 11-AA-0277
Short Caption:AKOBUCHI UDOH V. WASHINGTON CENTER FOR AGINGClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01823-10Filed Date:03/08/2011

Opening Event Date:03/08/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAkobuchi Udoh YPro SeN
RespondentWashington Center for AgingNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/08/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW - NPT PER 3/24/11 ORDER LW
03/08/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/24/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT, TO MARCH 8, 2011. It is *****MORE****
03/24/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed EITHER for having been UNTIMELY FILED...or for LACK OF STANDING since petitioner is not aggrieved since unemployment benefits were granted... (BY: ETW)
03/24/2011TMC - OTSC - motion for appointment of counsel
04/12/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPT OF COUNSEL
09/09/2011FiledLetter From asking court the status of case (Petitioner)
10/07/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
10/07/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
10/07/2011FiledDismissed
11/02/2011FiledMandate