judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EILEEN OAKLEY, FREMONT COUNTY ASSESSOR v. FREMONT COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT d/b/a CENTRAL WYOMING COLLEGE

Case Heading (S-09-0261)
Case Number:S-09-0261Case Docketed On:12/21/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:EILEEN OAKLEY, FREMONT COUNTY ASSESSOR v. FREMONT COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT d/b/a CENTRAL WYOMING COLLEGE
Full Title:EILEEN OAKLEY, FREMONT COUNTY ASSESSOR, Appellant (Respondent), v. FREMONT COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT d/b/a CENTRAL WYOMING COLLEGE, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEileen OakleyJodi A. Darrough
AppelleeJo Anne McFarlandFrank B. Watkins
AppelleeCentral Wyoming CollegeFrank B. Watkins

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real, Taxation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 106
Citation:236 P.3d 1004

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/21/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/21/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/03/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/22/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/06/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record & Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Watkins for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jodi A. Darrough for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice HillNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
04/21/2010Order - Assignment of judge - John C. Brooks, District Judge is assigned to act in this matter for Justice HillOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/05/2010Motion - Other - Amend CaptionMotionOtherFinal
05/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Amend CaptionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justice Golden, Kite and Burke, and Brooks, District Judge (Jodi A. Darrough, Deputy County Attorney for appellant; Frank B. Watkins for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/25/2010Order - Granting Motion to Correct CaptionOrderGrantFinal
07/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/17/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/17/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/18/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal