judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF NINA H. PARKHURST: M. GREGORY WEISZ v. NINA H. PARKHURST, by and through her attorney-in-fact RANDALL K. BOYKIN

Case Heading (S-09-0252)
Case Number:S-09-0252Case Docketed On:12/03/2009
Linked To: S-09-0251
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Guardian and Ward (Title 3)
Short Title:IN RE: THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF NINA H. PARKHURST: M. GREGORY WEISZ v. NINA H. PARKHURST, by and through her attorney-in-fact RANDALL K. BOYKIN
Full Title:IN RE: THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF NINA H. PARKHURST: M. GREGORY WEISZ, Appellant (Guardian ad Litem), v. NINA H. PARKHURST, by and through her attorney-in-fact RANDALL K. BOYKIN, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGreg Weisz Pro Se
AppelleeRandall K. BoykinWilliam L. Hiser
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverCarl Douglas BoykinJason M. Tangeman
Julie M. (Wickett) Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Guardianship
Opinion Number:2010 WY 155
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/20/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant M. Gregory Weisz, Guardian Ad Litem and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - for appellant Carl Boykin.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
03/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee - Parkhurst Duplicate Original in S-09-0251 send. Received copy of Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2010Event - Phone Call - to cournsel for Appellee, Original copy of brief in S-09-0251 send with copies of brief in S-09-0252. Requested replacement originalEventPhone CallFinal
03/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Nina H. Parkhurst, Original CopyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason M. Tangeman and Julie M. Wickett for Carl Douglas Boykin.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting William L. Hiser, counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from M. Gregory Weisz, Guardian ad LitemNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/13/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jason M. Tangeman and Michael (Greg) G. Weisz for appellants; William L. Hiser for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/01/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming S-09-0251 and dismissing S-09-0252, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/17/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/17/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/21/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/20/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal