judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DE LA CARRERA (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34599
Short Caption:DE LA CARRERA (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C118186Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/03/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07067
08/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 99-07409
09/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order appealed from filed in district court on: September 16, 1999. 99-09072
12/03/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on 12/01/99. 99-12103
12/03/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We note that appellant raised this issue in his motion to vacate or correct an illegal sentence. Because an ineffective assistance claim is not properly raised in such a motion we declined to address the issue on appeal from the district court's order denying the motion. The law of the case doctrine therefore does not apply in this case because we did not reach the merits of the ineffective assistance claim in appellant's prior appeal.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-06303
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06419
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2001. 01-06419