judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIS F. STREATER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 76-CF-11650
Short Caption:WILLIS F. STREATER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F54462-76Filed Date:11/11/1976

Opening Event Date:11/11/1976Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:03/07/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/05/1984

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillis F. Streater N
John A. Shorter, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/11/1976NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/22/1976PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL
08/15/1978AFFIRMED: Judgement affirming the judgement of conviction on appeal without printed opinion. (Judges Harris & Mack)
09/06/1978MANDATE ISSUED
05/16/1983RECORD ON APPEAL
10/11/1983APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/14/1983APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/07/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/07/1984ARGUED (NB,PY,YG)
07/06/1984AFFIRMED: Opinion affirming judgement of conviction. (NB,PY,YG)
07/19/1984APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to August 3, 1994. (Clerk's grant on 7/24/84)
08/06/1984APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
10/03/1984ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (Nw,Nb,Mk,Fe,Py,Be,Te,Ro,Ye)
10/05/1984MANDATE ISSUED
03/31/1994APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall the mandate and reinstate appeal.
03/31/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE MOTIONS TO RECALL THE MANDATE
04/11/1994TMC -3/31 mot to recall mandate & reinstate appeal 3/31 mot to consolidate w/85-CF-909 7/5 aple's oppo to recall mandaate 7/15 reply to oppo to recall mandate
07/05/1994RECEIVED appelle's opposition to motion to recall the mandate and reinstate appeal.
07/15/1994APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE AND REINSTATE APPEAL.
11/03/1994ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE REPLIES TO THE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS TO RECALL MANDATE, and the Clerk shall file the lodged replies. (by: SCKGNM)
11/03/1994ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE MOTIONS TO RECALL THE MANDATE (by: SCKGNM)
11/03/1994ORDER DENY APLT MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTIONS TO REINSTATE THE APPEALS IN no. 76-CF-11650 and inno. 85-CO-909. (by: SCKGNM)
12/02/1994RECEIVED appellant's petition for rehearing with suggested rehearing en banc. (Needs a motion for leave)
04/19/1995TMC - 12/2/94 Aplt's Petition for rehearing with suggestion for rehearing en banc
02/21/1996APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall the mandate
03/04/1996Appellant's Motion to Recall Mandate
03/04/1996TMC Motion to Recall Mandate
07/23/1996ORDER DENY APLT MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall mandate. (FESTKG)