judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN K. CALLEN, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0026)
Case Number:S-07-0026Case Docketed On:02/02/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:KEVIN K. CALLEN, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEVIN K. CALLEN, SR., Appellant (Defendant) v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin K. Callen Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Kirk Allan Morgan
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 107
Citation:192 P.3d 137

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/21/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/22/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/21/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/22/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record and brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
08/10/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dana Lent for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits; Volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/20/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Dana Jill Lent, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/20/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/12/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/1/08 by Joyce Boyer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal