judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHRICKER VS. ZIMMERMAN

Case Information: 33573
Short Caption:SCHRICKER VS. ZIMMERMANCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41186 , 42617
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9800165Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Jenkins, NathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson--check no. 034562.
01/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00101
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Orders filed 7/24/98 and 12/04/98. Due Date: 10 days
01/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 07/24/98. 99-00437
01/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 12/04/98. 99-00438
01/22/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00458
01/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent.) 99-00470
01/25/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
01/25/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dean R. Heidrich--check no. 4671.
01/29/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
02/08/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Docketing statement of appellant/cross-respondent Zimmerman. 99-00876
03/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-01789
03/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court. 99-02016
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-02368
04/08/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Dean Heidrich regarding caption in this matter. 99-02671
04/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Mailed letter to attorney Dean Heidrich in response to letter received on 04/08/99 (cc: Hale, Lane firm).
04/15/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-02956
07/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 99-06875
08/04/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Clarify Briefing Schedule. 99-07175
08/17/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Respondent's Motion to Clarify Briefing Schedule. 99-07668
09/30/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 28, 1999, appellant Zimmerman filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. fn2[We elect to treat appellant's notice as a motion to voluntarily dismiss her appeal]. We grant appellant's motion to dismiss her appeal. The clerk shall designate the parties to reflect Donald R. Schricker as appellant and Roslyn M. Zimmerman as respondent. Appellant Schricker shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Attorney Dean R. Heidrich shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, personally pay the sum of $250 to appellant Schricker to defray the costs associated with the delay of this appeal and separately file proof of payment with this court. Document No. 99-09462. 99-09462
10/05/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Agreement of Withdrawal of Counsel. 99-09556
10/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Proof of Payment of $250 to Donald Schricker from attorney Dean R. Heidrich. 99-09727
10/19/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Request for Extension of Time for Designation of Transcript. 99-10156
10/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the motion to withdraw filed by the firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard and Anderson. Further, to the extent the agreement and motion can be construed as a request to allow appellant to proceed in proper person., we deny such request. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. New counsel shall have 15 days from the filing of a notice of appearance to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a). The briefing schedule set forth in our order entered on October 1, 1999, shall remain in effect. Failure to comply with this order in a timely fashion may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. (Hale firm deleted from the docket as counsel for appellant). 99-10574
01/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Appellant failed to obtain counsel, and asserts that he cannot afford counsel. fn1[We have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We note that appellant requests that he be permitted to proceed in proper person. Appellant's request is denied]. Further, as appellant will not be represented by counsel in this matter, the briefing schedule formerly ordered in this case is hereby vacated. Original record due: 30 days. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-00154
01/05/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, unfiled, with letter, Opposition to Motion to Continue in pro per, and to Designate Transcript (pursuant to 1/5/00 order). 99-11656
01/18/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 01/14/00. 00-00796
01/18/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Motion to Reconsider. 00-01663
02/01/2002MotionFiled Motion. Request for Expedited Decision. 02-02152
06/06/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "AFFIRM the orders of the district court." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant and we deny all requested relief therein. We also deny respondent's motion to strike filed on February 2, 2000 and her motion for expedited decision filed on February 1, 2002.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-09869
06/17/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/17/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Rehearing) Due Date: 10 days
06/24/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Donald R. Schricker - check no. 5569.
06/28/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Substitution of Counsel. Respondent Roslyn Zimmerman, hereby substitutes Margaret S. Evans, Esq. In place of Dean R. Heidrich, Esq., as counsel of record. 02-11228
06/28/2002Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d).
07/10/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." Fn1 [Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered appellant's petition.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-11788
07/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 02-11843
07/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2002. 02-11843