Case Information: 08-CO-1277 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL POSEY V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal |
Lead: | 08-CO-1139 | Consolidated: | 08-CO-1277 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | FEL11756-88 | Filed Date: | 09/25/2008 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/25/2008 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/25/2008 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/01/2009 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Michael Posey | Y | |||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/25/2008 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
11/03/2008 | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 08-CO-1139 and 08-CO-1277 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies for appeal no. 08-CO-1277. It is FUTHER ORDERED that appellant shall address the issues raised in both appeals in a consolidated brief and the consolidated brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW) | |||
11/13/2008 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
11/13/2008 | APPENDIX | |||
11/24/2008 | MEMORANDUM, from Appellant, regarding the filing of a second appeal .. which was not his intent. | |||
11/25/2008 | RECORD COPIES (08-CO-1277)(case certified w/o jacket - courtview pleadings only) | |||
11/25/2008 | RECORD INDEX (08-CO-1277) | |||
11/25/2008 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
12/30/2008 | On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 21, 2009. (By: GP) | |||
01/22/2009 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/20/09 | |||
02/20/2009 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE | |||
02/23/2009 | TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appelee's motion to extend time to file brief - appellant's brief | |||
03/10/2009 | ORDERED that appellee's MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver t. Carr Mgm't, Inc. v. Nat'l Deli., Inc., 397 A.2d 914, 915 (D.C. 1979)... It is *****MORE****** | |||
03/10/2009 | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE***** | |||
03/10/2009 | FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the orders ARE HEREBY AFFIRMED. (BRTHST) | |||
03/10/2009 | RECEIVED Appellant's Response to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance | |||
03/24/2009 | RECEIVED - #1 (12 pgs/tape--1/18/08 proc.) | |||
04/01/2009 | MANDATE ISSUED |