judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NOWRAN H. SUILMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0262
Short Caption:NOWRAN H. SUILMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Lead:11-CM-0262Consolidated: 12-CO-0063
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2175-10Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/01/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNowran SuilmanYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Karen Shinskie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/16/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/16/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
03/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD -#1 (318pgs/Coney) 1/12-14/11 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (45pgs/Swaringer) 1/18/11 proc. w/CD
05/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/01/2011RECORD INDEX
06/01/2011RECORD COPIES
06/01/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (restitution information - filed 2/8/11)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to August 8, 2011 (no oppo).
07/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
08/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)
08/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/11/11.
10/07/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal pending resolution of Appellant's D.C. Code Sec. 23-110 motion (Appellant)Denied as Moot
11/14/2011Filedthe motion for stay is hereby held in abeyance for 90 days and directing appellant to advise this court of the status of the motion in trial court on or before January 16, 2012
01/13/2012FiledStatus Report regarding - 23-110 motion (Denied on January 10, 2012) (Appellant)
02/06/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-CM-262 and 12-CO-63 for all purposes herein, denying as moot appellant's motion to stay appeal no. 11-CM-262 and appointing counsel for appeal no. 12-CO-63
02/06/2012FiledAppointing Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to January 19, 2012 in appeal no. 12-CO-63
02/09/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CO-63)
02/09/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CO-63)
02/16/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/27/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
03/27/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
05/01/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/01/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/22/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/17/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Newman
11/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/28/2012FiledMandate
12/11/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)