judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTINA CAMILLERI v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0242)
Case Number:S-09-0242Case Docketed On:11/17/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:CHRISTINA CAMILLERI v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:CHRISTINA CAMILLERI, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristina CamilleriDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kristen Jocelyn Hanna

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 156
Citation:244 P.3d 52

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District Court (Kristen Hanna)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/05/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on Appeal. Hardcopy inadvertently dated "2009"EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance, copy of pleading filed in the District CourtNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/08/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/08/2010Motion - Other - Stay Briefing ScheduleMotionOtherFinal
02/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion to dismiss appeal; and memorandum in support of its motion.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for abeyance of briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2010Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
02/24/2010Response/Objection - Motion with brief in support of objection.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's response; and brief in support of denying appellee's motion to dismiss appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2010Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
03/30/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Petitioner, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/19/2010Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
04/20/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/25/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/02/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/09/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
12/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal