judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREEN (MAJOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38392
Short Caption:GREEN (MAJOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 58909
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173469Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14546
08/28/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 13, 2001 through June 15, 2001. Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: August 23, 2001. 01-14547
09/25/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Joseph D'Amato requesting extension of time to file transcripts in case nos. 36909/38187/38262/38330/38392 - case are not consolidated. 01-16189
09/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 25, 2001, court reporter Joseph A. D'Amato filed a letter, which this court elects to construe as a motion for an extension of time to file the requested transcripts in these appeals. The motion is granted. Mr. D'Amato shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts in these appeals or show cause why Mr. D'Amato should not be sanctioned. No further extensions will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Nos. 38187/38262/38330/38392-these cases are not consolidated. 01-16358
10/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16600
10/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 2, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-17274
10/25/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 13, 2001; June 14, 2001; and June 15, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 01-17961
12/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 01-21518
01/02/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 02-00102
01/02/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 02-00103
01/17/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-01228
03/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04601
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04878
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. 02-04878