judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVE T. HELM and VAN E. HELM v. KEN CLARK, Trustee, or his successor in trust, under the Ken Clark Living Trust dated March 28, 2006

Case Heading (S-10-0002)
Case Number:S-10-0002Case Docketed On:01/06/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:DAVE T. HELM and VAN E. HELM v. KEN CLARK, Trustee, or his successor in trust, under the Ken Clark Living Trust dated March 28, 2006
Full Title:DAVE T. HELM and VAN E. HELM, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. KEN CLARK, Trustee, or his successor in trust, under the Ken Clark Living Trust dated March 28, 2006, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDave T. HelmJoseph Bryce Bluemel
AppellantVan E. HelmJoseph Bryce Bluemel
AppelleeKen ClarkJack Daniel Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real - Adverse Possession
Opinion Number:2010 WY 168
Citation:244 P.3d 1052 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received from counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
01/06/2010Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk requesting NOA.EventPhone CallFinal
01/06/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
01/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/07/2010Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
01/13/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
02/01/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/05/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/26/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file appellee's brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/21/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief; received copy of notice of change of address for Defendant's (Appellee) counsel of record; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/08/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joseph Bluemel for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jack Edwards for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2010Order - Oral argument - amending schedule. Argument moved from August 18 to August 16.OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
08/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Joseph B. Bluemel for appellant; Jack D. Edwards for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/21/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/10/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal